Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sunil, Preetha, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sukumaran, Sunilkumar, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 16th Judicial District Court with Shipman, Sherry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShipman, Sherry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House16th Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Judges' Docket Notes from Case File | |
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Cert. of Notice to Employer of Order Withholding (SMS InFomm Corporation: delivered on 3/25/13) (SMS InFomm Corporation: delivered on 3/25/13) |
|
March 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order/Notice to Withhold Income For Child Support (Judicial Officer: Shipman, Sherry ) Payor: Sukumaran, Sunilkumar Payor: Sukumaran, Sunilkumar |
|
September 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Child Support info updated/added to State Disbursement Unit | |
September 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Rivera-Worley, Carmen ) Agreed Decree of Divorce for Parties: Sukumaran, Sunilkumar for Parties: Sunil, Preetha Agreed Decree of Divorce |
|
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Prove-Up Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Rivera-Worley, Carmen) one hour set 7-2-12 by Mr. Wohr; Changed to prove up hearing 9-19-12 by Mr. Wohr one hour set 7-2-12 by Mr. Wohr; Changed to prove up hearing 9-19-12 by Mr. Wohr |
|
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw As Counsel Pass No Hearing Wanted At This Time CANCELED Motion to Withdraw As Counsel (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Rivera-Worley, Carmen) Pass No Hearing Wanted At This Time set 6-29-12 by Mr. Haugen |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Withdrawal/Substitution of Counsel/Attorney Party: Haugen, John G. Party 2: Sukumaran, Sunilkumar Party: Haugen, John G.Party 2: Sukumaran, Sunilkumar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.