Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lewisville Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by George C. Scherer, against Smith, Nancy, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 393rd Judicial District Court with Bailey, Jonathan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBailey, Jonathan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House393rd Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
April 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Judges' Docket Notes from Case File | |
January 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Bookkeeping Notes Issued ck2038 to Denton County Tax Assessor; from tax sale proceeds Issued ck2038 to Denton County Tax Assessor; from tax sale proceeds |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Order to Disburse Funds (Judicial Officer: Robison, Douglas ) | |
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Disburse Funds Party: Lewisville Independent School District to Disburse Funds |
|
June 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Letter From plaintiff's attorney re: Special instructions for issuance of order of sale. From plaintiff's attorney re: Special instructions for issuance of order of sale. |
|
June 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale Tax; (X1); Issued and returned to plaintiff's attorney as requested-1 Smith, Nancy Served 07/11/2012 2:00 PM Returned 07/12/2012 Serving Officer Royea, Jon Tax; (X1); Issued and returned to plaintiff's attorney as requested-1 |
|
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: With copy of Judgment Party: Smith, Nancy With copy of Judgment |
|
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Billing Statement Sent to: Smith, Nancy Sent to: Smith, Nancy |
|
April 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Robison, Douglas ) Judgment for Parties: City Of The Colony for Parties: County Of Denton for Parties: Lewisville Independent School District for Parties: Smith, Nancy Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.