Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lewisville Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by George C. Scherer, against Johnson, Alfred, Unknow Heirs Successors Assigns, Unknown Owners Adverse Claimants, represented by William Travis Biggs, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 362nd Judicial District Court with McFarling, Bruce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcFarling, Bruce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House362nd Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Bookkeeping Notes Issued ck 2935 to Denton County Tax Assessor - disbursement of unclaimed excess funds Issued ck 2935 to Denton County Tax Assessor - disbursement of unclaimed excess funds |
|
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Bookkeeping Notes Issued ck 2380 to Denton County Tax Assessor Issued ck 2380 to Denton County Tax Assessor |
|
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Financial transaction listing | |
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: McFarling, Bruce ) On Intervenor's Motion To Disburse Excess Funds On Intervenor's Motion To Disburse Excess Funds |
|
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Disbursement of Proceeds from Tax Sale Filed by: City Of Lewisville Filed by: City Of Lewisville |
|
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Bookkeeping Notes Issued ck 2356 to Denton County Tax Assessor (from tax sale proceeds) Issued ck 2356 to Denton County Tax Assessor (from tax sale proceeds) |
|
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Disburse Funds (Judicial Officer: McFarling, Bruce ) Excess Proceeds Excess Proceeds |
|
September 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Petition To Disburse Excess Proceeds Party: Lewisville Independent School District Party: Scherer, George C. To Disburse Excess Proceeds |
|
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail re: notice of excess funds: returned by USPS - vacant - unable to foward re: notice of excess funds: returned by USPS - vacant - unable to foward |
|
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Financial transaction listing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.