Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Denton Independent School District, City Of Denton, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Mark A Burroughs, Gregory J. Sawko, against Whitlow, James M, Johnson, Tonya D Whitlow, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 367th Judicial District Court with Barnes, Margaret E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarnes, Margaret E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House367th Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Judges' Docket Notes from Case File | |
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Barnes, Margaret E. ) Order Of Dismissal for Parties: City Of Denton for Parties: Denton Independent School District for Parties: Johnson, Tonya D Whitlow for Parties: Whitlow, James M Order Of Dismissal |
|
November 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: City Of Denton Party: Denton Independent School District Party: City Of DentonParty: Denton Independent School District |
|
November 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (partial case closing) (Judicial Officer: Barnes, Margaret E. ) Order Of Dismissal for Parties: County Of Denton for Parties: Johnson, Tonya D Whitlow for Parties: Whitlow, James M Order Of Dismissal |
|
November 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Barnes, Margaret E.) Case set from Scheduling Order Case set from Scheduling Order |
|
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Bragg, Gilbert T. Party: County Of Denton Party: Bragg, Gilbert T.Party: County Of Denton |
|
August 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Scheduling Order (Judicial Officer: Barnes, Margaret E. ) | |
August 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Courts Dismissal Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Barnes, Margaret E.) | |
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Jury/Jury Dismissal Setting Mailed to: Sawko, Gregory J. Mailed to: Sawko, Gregory J. |
|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Jury/Jury Dismissal Setting Mailed to: Bragg, Gilbert T. Mailed to: Bragg, Gilbert T. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.