Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
First Citizens Bank And Trust Co, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Thomas M. Corea, against Gilliam, David W, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 393rd Judicial District Court with Isaacks, Vicki Party(Gilliam, David WJudgment: ( - Other Judgment Amt: 0.00 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryDebt/Contract: Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House393rd Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy of Final Order Sent to Resp or Defendant(s) AT LAST KNOWN ADDRESS CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL SENT TO DEFENDANT(S) (CCSD) Page BC AT LAST KNOWN ADDRESS CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL SENT TO DEFENDANT(S) (CCSD) |
|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit WITHOUT PREJUDICE (FILED BY PLAINTIFF) NOTICE OF NON-SUIT (NNS) Vol./Book IMG, Page RCH WITHOUT PREJUDICE (FILED BY PLAINTIFF) NOTICE OF NON-SUIT (NNS) |
|
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Record/Copy Request THE COREA FIRM RECORD/COPY REQUEST BY (RCR) Vol./Book IMG, Page RCH THE COREA FIRM RECORD/COPY REQUEST BY (RCR) |
|
February 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT HEARING (FILED BY FIRST CITIZENS BANK AND TRUST CO.) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (PLM) Vol./Book IMG, Page RCH FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT HEARING (FILED BY FIRST CITIZENS BANK AND TRUST CO.) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (PLM) |
|
February 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address (FOR DAVID W. GILLIAM, FILED BY PLAINTIFF) CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS (CLKA) Vol./Book IMG, Page RCH (FOR DAVID W. GILLIAM, FILED BY PLAINTIFF) CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS (CLKA) |
|
February 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response(s) (FILED BY DAVID GILLIAM) DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE (DR) Vol./Book IMG, Page RCH (FILED BY DAVID GILLIAM) DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE (DR) |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation returned: Delivered to: DAVID W GILLIAM ON 1/10/08 CITATION(S) RETURNED DELIVERED TO: (CRD) Vol./Book IMG, Page RCH DAVID W GILLIAM ON 1/10/08 CITATION(S) RETURNED DELIVERED TO: (CRD) |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition FOR ENFORCEMENT OF SECURITY AGREEMENT FOR POSSESSION OF SECURED COLLATERAL PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION (POP) Vol./Book IMG, Page SAS FOR ENFORCEMENT OF SECURITY AGREEMENT FOR POSSESSION OF SECURED COLLATERAL PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION (POP) |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation to David Gilliam (pick up at front desk by courier) CITATION(S) ISSUED FOR: (CIT) Vol./Book IMG, Page SAS to David Gilliam (pick up at front desk by courier) CITATION(S) ISSUED FOR: (CIT) |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Opening Filing Event Case Filing Case Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.