Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Washington Mutual Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by John M. Ledyard, against State Of Texas, Jm3 Investments Llc, Hooper, David G., Farmer'S Merchant'S State Bank, represented by Clifford D. Harmon, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 367th Judicial District Court with Gabriel, Lee Party(State Of TexasJudgment: ( - Other Judgment Amt: 0.00 ORDER GRANTING DEFAULT JUDGMENT DEFAULT JUDGMENT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryDebt/Contract: Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House367th Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Record/Copy Request HOLLY CARTER RECORD/COPY REQUEST BY (RCR) Vol./Book IMG, Page PRM HOLLY CARTER RECORD/COPY REQUEST BY (RCR) |
|
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Courts Dismissal Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Gabriel, Lee) | |
February 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous (UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE TRACK & CONFIRM) MISCELLANEOUS (MISC) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM (UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE TRACK & CONFIRM) MISCELLANEOUS (MISC) |
|
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Jury/Jury Dismissal Setting NOTICE OF NON-JURY AND JURY DISMISSAL SETTING (NNJJD) Vol./Book IMG, Page ML NOTICE OF NON-JURY AND JURY DISMISSAL SETTING (NNJJD) |
|
November 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion For Summary Judgment (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gabriel, Lee) Motion for Default Motion for Default |
|
November 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: CLIFFORD D. HARMON RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE SENT TO (R.306) Vol./Book IMG, Page PRM CLIFFORD D. HARMON RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE SENT TO (R.306) |
|
October 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice SETTING HEARING DATE (FILED BY JOHN LEDYARD) NOTICE (NOT) Vol./Book IMG, Page BC SETTING HEARING DATE (FILED BY JOHN LEDYARD) NOTICE (NOT) |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion For Summary Judgment (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Gabriel, Lee) Motion for Default Motion for Default |
|
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice SETTING HEARING DATE (FILED BY JOHN LEDYARD) NOTICE (NOT) Vol./Book IMG, Page BC SETTING HEARING DATE (FILED BY JOHN LEDYARD) NOTICE (NOT) |
|
September 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion For Summary Judgment (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Gabriel, Lee) Motion for Default Motion for Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.