Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Collins, Brandi Shea, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jamme, Joshua, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 362nd Judicial District Court with Vick, Phillip presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House362nd Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Administrative Writ Order-Notice of Withholding (AIWH)
Date: July 09, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Collins, Brandi Shea Party: Jamme, Joshua Party: Nacol, Mark A Party: Collins, Brandi SheaParty: Jamme, JoshuaParty: Nacol, Mark A |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: McFarling, Bruce ) Order of Dismissal for Parties: Collins, Brandi Shea for Parties: Jamme, Joshua Order of Dismissal |
|
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Courts Dismissal Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer McFarling, Bruce) AG Case-Ok to Dismiss per AG AG Case-Ok to Dismiss per AG |
|
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Jury/Jury Dismissal Setting Mailed to: Collins, Brandi Shea Mailed to: Jamme, Joshua Mailed to: Nacol, Mark A Mailed to: Collins, Brandi SheaMailed to: Jamme, JoshuaMailed to: Nacol, Mark A |
|
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Jury/Jury Dismissal Setting | |
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Jury/Jury Dismissal Setting Mailed to: Attorney General of Texas - Child Support Mailed to: Collins, Brandi Shea Mailed to: Jamme, Joshua Mailed to: Nacol, Mark A Mailed to: Attorney General of Texas - Child SupportMailed to: Collins, Brandi SheaMailed to: Jamme, JoshuaMailed to: Nacol, Mark A |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw As Counsel Pass No Hearing Wanted At This Time CANCELED Motion to Withdraw As Counsel (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer McFarling, Bruce) Pass No Hearing Wanted At This Time Set by Elizabeth Windleys office by phone on 11-3-2014 @ 10:55 |
|
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Hearing Pass No Hearing Wanted At This Time CANCELED Temporary Orders Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McFarling, Bruce) Pass No Hearing Wanted At This Time and M:Confer, Docket Call 11-21-2014- Set by Elizabeth Windley and Mark Nacol in person on 10-2-2014 @ 4:06 |
|
November 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Withdraw/Substitute Counsel (Judicial Officer: Lawlis, Monte ) Attorney: Windley, Elizabeth Patton For Party: Collins, Brandi Shea Attorney: Windley, Elizabeth PattonFor Party: Collins, Brandi Shea |
|
November 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Call (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McFarling, Bruce) Temporary Orders and M:Confer set on 12-8-2012- Set by Elizabeth Windley and Mark Nacol in person on 10-2-2014 @ 4:07 Temporary Orders and M:Confer set on 12-8-2012- Set by Elizabeth Windley and Mark Nacol in person on 10-2-2014 @ 4:07 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.