Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Virani, Shirin Abdul, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Halani, Ashif E., in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 211th Judicial District Court with Gabriel, Lee Party(Halani, Ashif E.Judgment: ( - Other Judgment Amt: 0.00 FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE DEFAULT JUDGMENT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House211th Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notes NO ADDRESS FOR ASHIF E HALANI TO SEND CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE TO NOTES (NOTE) NO ADDRESS FOR ASHIF E HALANI TO SEND CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE TO NOTES (NOTE) |
|
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics FORM VS-165 SENT TO BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS (VS) FORM VS-165 SENT TO BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS (VS) |
|
June 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Second Amended PETITION FOR DIVORCE SECOND AMENDED (2AM) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM PETITION FOR DIVORCE SECOND AMENDED (2AM) |
|
May 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Appointment AFTER PUBLICATION(TRICIA PERRY APPOINTED ATTY FOR ASHIF E HALANI) APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM (AAAL) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM AFTER PUBLICATION(TRICIA PERRY APPOINTED ATTY FOR ASHIF E HALANI) APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM (AAAL) |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion for Appointment OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM AFTER PUBLICATION (FILED BY SHIRIN ABDUL VIRANI) MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT (MFA) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM AFTER PUBLICATION (FILED BY SHIRIN ABDUL VIRANI) MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT (MFA) |
|
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Record/Copy Request MARIAN WILSON RECORD/COPY REQUEST BY (RCR) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM MARIAN WILSON RECORD/COPY REQUEST BY (RCR) |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Affidavit ASHIF E HALANI, PUBLISHED 01/24/08 AFFIDAVIT FROM DENTON RECORD CHRONICLE-PUBLICATION (A/DRC) Vol./Book IMG, Page ML ASHIF E HALANI, PUBLISHED 01/24/08 AFFIDAVIT FROM DENTON RECORD CHRONICLE-PUBLICATION (A/DRC) |
|
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Issuance returned; Executed TO:ASHIF E HALANI, PUBLISHED IN THE DENTON RECORD CHRONICLE CITATION BY PUBLICATION RETURNED EXECUTED (CBPR) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM TO:ASHIF E HALANI, PUBLISHED IN THE DENTON RECORD CHRONICLE CITATION BY PUBLICATION RETURNED EXECUTED (CBPR) |
|
January 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation ISSUED TO:ASHIF E HALANI (PUT IN ATTY'S BOX) CITATION BY PUBLICATION (CBP) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM ISSUED TO:ASHIF E HALANI (PUT IN ATTY'S BOX) CITATION BY PUBLICATION (CBP) |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
First Amended (Original) Petition FOR DIVORCE FIRST AMENDED PETITION (FAP) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM FOR DIVORCE FIRST AMENDED PETITION (FAP) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.