Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rbls Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael L. Geller, against Mutschler, Dale, Mutschler, Carolyn, represented by Cara D Kennemer, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 158th Judicial District Court with Collier, Jake presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryDebt/Contract: Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House158th Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Geller, Michael L. Party: Kennemer, Cara D Party: Geller, Michael L.Party: Kennemer, Cara D |
|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Collier, Jake) *DWOP* *DWOP* |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Collier, Jake ) Order Granting Joint Motion for Non-Suit with Prejudice for Parties: Mutschler, Carolyn for Parties: Mutschler, Dale for Parties: Rbls INC Order Granting Joint Motion for Non-Suit with Prejudice |
|
October 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Joint Motion for Non-Suit with Prejudice for Non-Suit with Prejudice |
|
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER (SO) Scheduling Order SCHEDULING ORDER (SO) Vol./Book IMG, Page ML |
|
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Courts Dismissal Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Collier, Jake) | |
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from: MICHAEL GELLER VACATION LETTER FROM (VL) Vol./Book IMG, Page ML MICHAEL GELLER VACATION LETTER FROM (VL) |
|
September 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from: FROM MICHAEL GELLER ATTORNEY VACATION LETTER & OUT OF OFFICE (AVL) Vol./Book IMG, Page AMG FROM MICHAEL GELLER ATTORNEY VACATION LETTER & OUT OF OFFICE (AVL) |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Original Answer VERIFIED DENIAL, AND ORIGINAL COUNTERCLAIM (DEFENDANTS') ORIGINAL ANSWER (OA) Vol./Book IMG, Page BC VERIFIED DENIAL, AND ORIGINAL COUNTERCLAIM (DEFENDANTS') ORIGINAL ANSWER (OA) |
|
January 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certificate REGARDING SERVICE (CITATIONS RETURNED DELIVERED TO DALE MUTSCHLER AND CAROLYN MUTSCHLER THROUGH THEIR COUNSEL, CARA KENNEMER, ON 1/8/08) CERTIFICATE (CERT) Vol./Book IMG, Page BC REGARDING SERVICE (CITATIONS RETURNED DELIVERED TO DALE MUTSCHLER AND CAROLYN MUTSCHLER THROUGH THEIR COUNSEL, CARA KENNEMER, ON 1/8/08) CERTIFICATE (CERT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.