Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by District Attorney, against Riddle, Carl, Marcom, James Brent, Driscoll, Frank C, Cutler, Robert Michael, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 158th Judicial District Court with Collier, Jake Party(Riddle, CarlJudgment: ( - Other Judgment Amt: 0.00 DEFAULT JUDGMENT DEFAULT JUDGMENT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
|
Filing Court House158th Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: DEFENDANTS RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE SENT TO (R.306) Vol./Book IMG, Page RCH DEFENDANTS RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE SENT TO (R.306) |
|
October 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Affidavit ON CARL RIDDLE WAS PUBLISHED ON 09/24 AND 10/1,8,&15/2008 AFFIDAVIT FROM DENTON RECORD CHRONICLE-PUBLICATION (A/DRC) Vol./Book IMG, Page AMG ON CARL RIDDLE WAS PUBLISHED ON 09/24 AND 10/1,8,&15/2008 AFFIDAVIT FROM DENTON RECORD CHRONICLE-PUBLICATION (A/DRC) |
|
September 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Issuance returned; Executed FOR CARL RIDDLE TO BE PUBLISHED 9/24/08, 10/01/08 10/08/08, AND 10/15/08 CITATION BY PUBLICATION RETURNED EXECUTED (CBPR) Vol./Book IMG, Page LA FOR CARL RIDDLE TO BE PUBLISHED 9/24/08, 10/01/08 10/08/08, AND 10/15/08 CITATION BY PUBLICATION RETURNED EXECUTED (CBPR) |
|
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Citation by Publication or Posting AFFIDAVIT FOR CITATION BY PUBLICATION (AFCP) Vol./Book IMG, Page RCH AFFIDAVIT FOR CITATION BY PUBLICATION (AFCP) |
|
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT SENT TO FRANK DRISCOLL CERTIFIED COPY (C/C) Page PRM OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT SENT TO FRANK DRISCOLL CERTIFIED COPY (C/C) |
|
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation ISSUED TO CARL RIDDLE (SHERIFF BOX) CITATION BY PUBLICATION (CBP) Vol./Book IMG, Page RCH ISSUED TO CARL RIDDLE (SHERIFF BOX) CITATION BY PUBLICATION (CBP) |
|
September 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy of Final Order Sent to Resp or Defendant(s) AT LAST KNOWN MAILING ADDRESS (JAMES MARCOM) CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL SENT TO DEFENDANT(S) (CCSD) AT LAST KNOWN MAILING ADDRESS (JAMES MARCOM) CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL SENT TO DEFENDANT(S) (CCSD) |
|
September 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service Members Civil Relief Act Affidavit AS TO JAMES MARCOM SERVICE MEMBERS CIVIL RELIEF ACT AFFIDAVIT (SRVM) Vol./Book IMG, Page CP AS TO JAMES MARCOM SERVICE MEMBERS CIVIL RELIEF ACT AFFIDAVIT (SRVM) |
|
September 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS (CLKA) Certificate of Last Known Address CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS (CLKA) Vol./Book IMG, Page CP |
|
August 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation returned: Delivered to: JAMES BRENT MARCOM ON 08/17/08 CITATION(S) RETURNED DELIVERED TO: (CRD) Vol./Book IMG, Page AM JAMES BRENT MARCOM ON 08/17/08 CITATION(S) RETURNED DELIVERED TO: (CRD) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.