Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lewisville Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by George C. Scherer, against Powell, Corey, Powell, Amy, represented by Jeffrey C. Tasker, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 367th Judicial District Court with Gabriel, Lee Party(Powell, CoreyJudgment: ( - Other Judgment Amt: 0.00 ORDER OF DISMISSAL(LISD DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House367th Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS (MTD) Motion MOTION TO DISMISS (MTD) Vol./Book IMG, Page CP |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer COREY AND AMY POWELL DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER (DOA) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT COREY AND AMY POWELL DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER (DOA) |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Letter DEF ATTY RE:DOA ENCLOSED LETTER (LETTER) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT DEF ATTY RE:DOA ENCLOSED LETTER (LETTER) |
|
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation returned: Delivered to: HIGHLAND SHORES OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC 1-9-08 CITATION(S) RETURNED DELIVERED TO: (CRD) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT HIGHLAND SHORES OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC 1-9-08 CITATION(S) RETURNED DELIVERED TO: (CRD) |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation returned: Delivered to: FRANKLIN CREDIT MGMT CORP 1-10-08 CITATION(S) RETURNED DELIVERED TO: (CRD) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT FRANKLIN CREDIT MGMT CORP 1-10-08 CITATION(S) RETURNED DELIVERED TO: (CRD) |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation returned: Delivered to: AMY POWELL 1-16-08 CITATION(S) RETURNED DELIVERED TO: (CRD) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT AMY POWELL 1-16-08 CITATION(S) RETURNED DELIVERED TO: (CRD) |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation returned: Delivered to: COREY POWELL 1-9-08 CITATION(S) RETURNED DELIVERED TO: (CRD) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT COREY POWELL 1-9-08 CITATION(S) RETURNED DELIVERED TO: (CRD) |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation (X4)COREY POWELL;AMY POWELL;FRANKLIN CREDIT MGMT CORP;HIGHLAND SHORES OAI CITATION(S) ISSUED FOR: (CIT) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT (X4)COREY POWELL;AMY POWELL;FRANKLIN CREDIT MGMT CORP;HIGHLAND SHORES OAI CITATION(S) ISSUED FOR: (CIT) |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition LISD PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION (POP) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT LISD PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION (POP) |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Opening Filing Event Case Filing Case Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.