Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Northstar Bank Of Texas, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Angela J Hindman, against Lakeview Custom Pools North Inc., Huddleston, Michael W., Hill, Lance, Compass Bank, A & A Pool Service Co Inc, (total of 5) See All represented by William J. Brotherton, R. Spencer Shytles, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 16th Judicial District Court with Rivera-Worley, Carmen Party(Compass BankJudgment: ( - Other Judgment Amt: 0.00 ORDER OF NON-SUIT OF ALL CLAIMS OF ACTION AGAINST COMPASS BANK ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryDebt/Contract: Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House16th Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suit (Notice Or Order) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Record/Copy Request AMANDA CUNNINGHAM RECORD/COPY REQUEST BY (RCR) Vol./Book IMG, Page TL AMANDA CUNNINGHAM RECORD/COPY REQUEST BY (RCR) |
|
November 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: ANGELA J HINDMAN, R. SPENCER SHYTLES RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE SENT TO (R.306) Vol./Book IMG, Page SLM ANGELA J HINDMAN, R. SPENCER SHYTLES RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE SENT TO (R.306) |
|
November 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit OF ALL CAUSES OF ACTION AGAINST COMPASS BANK (FILED BY PLAINTIFF) NOTICE OF NON-SUIT (NNS) Vol./Book IMG, Page SLM OF ALL CAUSES OF ACTION AGAINST COMPASS BANK (FILED BY PLAINTIFF) NOTICE OF NON-SUIT (NNS) |
|
November 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rivera-Worley, Carmen) Result: Pass - No Hearing Wanted at This Time | |
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: ANGELA J HINDMAN, R. SPENCER SHYTLES, A&A POOL SERVICE CO. INC., LANCE HILL, MICHAEL W. HUDDLESTON RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE SENT TO (R.306) Vol./Book IMG, Page SLM ANGELA J HINDMAN, R. SPENCER SHYTLES, A&A POOL SERVICE CO. INC., LANCE HILL, MICHAEL W. HUDDLESTON RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE SENT TO (R.306) |
|
October 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NON-SUIT OF ALL CAUSES OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT A&A POOL SERVICE CO., INC. PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF (PN) Vol./Book IMG, Page SLM NON-SUIT OF ALL CAUSES OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT A&A POOL SERVICE CO., INC. PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF (PN) |
|
October 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NON-SUIT OF ALL CAUSES OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT MICHAEL HUDDLESTON PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF (PN) Vol./Book IMG, Page SLM NON-SUIT OF ALL CAUSES OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT MICHAEL HUDDLESTON PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF (PN) |
|
October 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NON-SUIT OF ALL CAUSES OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT LANCE HILL PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF (PN) Vol./Book IMG, Page SLM NON-SUIT OF ALL CAUSES OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT LANCE HILL PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF (PN) |
|
August 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Jury/Jury Dismissal Setting TO R SPENCER SHYTLES, WILLIAM J BROTHERTON, ANGELA J HINDMAN NOTICE OF NON-JURY DISMISSAL SETTING (NNJ) Vol./Book IMG, Page SLM TO R SPENCER SHYTLES, WILLIAM J BROTHERTON, ANGELA J HINDMAN NOTICE OF NON-JURY DISMISSAL SETTING (NNJ) |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Document(s) FROM ANGELA J HINDMAN RULE 11 AGREEMENT (R11AG) Vol./Book IMG, Page SLM FROM ANGELA J HINDMAN RULE 11 AGREEMENT (R11AG) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.