Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by District Attorney, against Dickey, Brent Clark, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 211th Judicial District Court with Shipman, L. Dee Party(Dickey, Brent ClarkJudgment: ( - Other Judgment Amt: 0.00 ORDER OF NONSUIT DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryJudgment Nisi - Bond Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House211th Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy of Final Order Sent to Resp or Defendant(s) CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT/DECREE SENT TO RESPONDENT(S) (CCSR) CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT/DECREE SENT TO RESPONDENT(S) (CCSR) |
|
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR NON-SUIT (MN/S) Motion for Non-Suit MOTION FOR NON-SUIT (MN/S) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM |
|
January 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer EDITH BURGESS, AGENT, D/B/A (BURGESS BAIL BONDS) DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER (DOA) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM EDITH BURGESS, AGENT, D/B/A (BURGESS BAIL BONDS) DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER (DOA) |
|
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Returned and filed green card for certified mail sent to: BURGESS EDITH RCVD BY MANUEL GULY NO DATE OF DELIVERY RETURNED AND FILED GREEN CARD MAILED TO: (RFG) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM BURGESS EDITH RCVD BY MANUEL GULY NO DATE OF DELIVERY RETURNED AND FILED GREEN CARD MAILED TO: (RFG) |
|
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Returned and filed green card for certified mail sent to: BRENT CLARK DICKEY RCVD BY R E DICKEY ON 01/04/07 RETURNED AND FILED GREEN CARD MAILED TO: (RFG) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM BRENT CLARK DICKEY RCVD BY R E DICKEY ON 01/04/07 RETURNED AND FILED GREEN CARD MAILED TO: (RFG) |
|
January 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation EDITH BURGESS CITATION BY CERTIFIED MAIL (CCM) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM EDITH BURGESS CITATION BY CERTIFIED MAIL (CCM) |
|
January 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation TO:BRENT CLARK DICKEY CITATION BY CERTIFIED MAIL (CCM) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM TO:BRENT CLARK DICKEY CITATION BY CERTIFIED MAIL (CCM) |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judgment Nisi F-2006-0937-C, BOND 5,000.00 JUDGMENT NISI (JN) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM F-2006-0937-C, BOND 5,000.00 JUDGMENT NISI (JN) |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Opening Filing Event Case Filing Case Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.