Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by District District Attorney, against Ruffin, Vandrix Renard, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 211th Judicial District Court with Cleveland, David Party(Ruffin, Vandrix RenardJudgment: ( - Other Judgment Amt: 0.00 DPL AGREED JUDGMENT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryJudgment Nisi - Bond Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House211th Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy of Final Order Sent to Resp or Defendant(s) STEPHEN WOHR, AND VANDRIX RENARD RUFFIN CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL SENT TO DEFENDANT(S) (CCSD) STEPHEN WOHR, AND VANDRIX RENARD RUFFIN CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL SENT TO DEFENDANT(S) (CCSD) |
|
October 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Bill of Costs SENT TO:STEPHEN WOHR BILL OF COSTS (BOC) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM SENT TO:STEPHEN WOHR BILL OF COSTS (BOC) |
|
September 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Compliance Review 2006-30393-2 09/28/07 COMPLIANCE REVIEW (Original filed within 31 days) (COMPR) COMPLIANCE REVIEW 2006-30393-2 09/28/07 COMPLIANCE REVIEW (Original filed within 31 days) (COMPR) COMPLIANCE REVIEW |
|
January 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Original Answer (DEFENDANT ALLEGHENY CASUALTY COMPANY STEPHEN WOHR D/B/A FREEBIRD BAIL BONDS') ORIGINAL ANSWER (OA) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM (DEFENDANT ALLEGHENY CASUALTY COMPANY STEPHEN WOHR D/B/A FREEBIRD BAIL BONDS') ORIGINAL ANSWER (OA) |
|
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation by certified mail returned undelivered for: TO:VANDRIX RENARD RUFFIN(INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS, APT # ? CITATION BY CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERED FOR: (CCMRU) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM TO:VANDRIX RENARD RUFFIN(INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS, APT # ? CITATION BY CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERED FOR: (CCMRU) |
|
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Returned and filed green card for certified mail sent to: ALLEGHENY CASUALTY COMPANY RCVD BY ROGER MOORE ON 01/05/07 RETURNED AND FILED GREEN CARD MAILED TO: (RFG) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM ALLEGHENY CASUALTY COMPANY RCVD BY ROGER MOORE ON 01/05/07 RETURNED AND FILED GREEN CARD MAILED TO: (RFG) |
|
January 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation TO:VANDRIX RENARD RUFFIN CITATION BY CERTIFIED MAIL (CCM) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM TO:VANDRIX RENARD RUFFIN CITATION BY CERTIFIED MAIL (CCM) |
|
January 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation TO:ALLEGTHENY CASUALTY CO CITATION BY CERTIFIED MAIL (CCM) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM TO:ALLEGTHENY CASUALTY CO CITATION BY CERTIFIED MAIL (CCM) |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judgment Nisi F-2006-1052-C, BOND 25,000.00 JUDGMENT NISI (JN) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM F-2006-1052-C, BOND 25,000.00 JUDGMENT NISI (JN) |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Opening Filing Event Case Filing Case Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.