Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by District Attorney, against Norman, Tiffney, Chandler, Felisa, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 431st Judicial District Court with Bailey, Jonathan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
|
Filing Court House431st Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Bailey, Jonathan ) Order of Dismissal for Parties: Chandler, Felisa for Parties: Norman, Tiffney for Parties: The State Of Texas Order of Dismissal |
|
January 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Order Transferring Cases to the 431st District Court | |
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Collier, Jake) *for Out-of-State Subpoenas* *for Out-of-State Subpoenas* |
|
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
Service Issued TO:FELISA CHANDLER (CALLED DISTRICT ATTY'S OFC TO PICK UP) SHOW CAUSE ISSUED (SC) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM TO:FELISA CHANDLER (CALLED DISTRICT ATTY'S OFC TO PICK UP) SHOW CAUSE ISSUED (SC) |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (OTSC) Order to Show Cause ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (OTSC) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (AFI) Affidavit AFFIDAVIT (AFI) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
OCA Reporting: New Suit (OCAN) OCA Reporting: New suit OCA Reporting: New Suit (OCAN) |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Petition FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PETITION (PET) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PETITION (PET) |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Service Issued TO:TIFFNEY NORMAN (CALLED DISTRICT ATTY'S OFC TO PU) SHOW CAUSE ISSUED (SC) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM TO:TIFFNEY NORMAN (CALLED DISTRICT ATTY'S OFC TO PU) SHOW CAUSE ISSUED (SC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.