Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carrollton-Farmers Branch Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Daniel K Bearden, Jr., against Coleman, Marisol Dimas, Coleman, Billy, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 158th Judicial District Court with Collier, Jake Party(Coleman, Marisol DimasJudgment: ( - Other Judgment Amt: 0.00 ORDER OF DISMISSAL(CFB-ISD DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House158th Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion CFB-ISD MOTION TO DISMISS (MTD) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT CFB-ISD MOTION TO DISMISS (MTD) |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Letter PLTF ATTY RE:VARIOUS DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED & C/C CKS IN MULTIPLE CASES LETTER (LETTER) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT PLTF ATTY RE:VARIOUS DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED & C/C CKS IN MULTIPLE CASES LETTER (LETTER) |
|
February 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation returned: Delivered to: BILLY COLEMAN 1-25-07 CITATION(S) RETURNED DELIVERED TO: (CRD) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT BILLY COLEMAN 1-25-07 CITATION(S) RETURNED DELIVERED TO: (CRD) |
|
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation returned: Delivered to: MARISOL DIMAS COLEMAN 1-18-07 CITATION(S) RETURNED DELIVERED TO: (CRD) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT MARISOL DIMAS COLEMAN 1-18-07 CITATION(S) RETURNED DELIVERED TO: (CRD) |
|
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issuance returned BILLY COLEMAN(SUBJ DOES NOT LIVE @ ADDRESS) CITATION RETURNED UNSERVED (CRU) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT BILLY COLEMAN(SUBJ DOES NOT LIVE @ ADDRESS) CITATION RETURNED UNSERVED (CRU) |
|
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issuance returned MARISON DIMAS COLEMAN(SUBJ DOES NOT LIVE @ ADDRESS) CITATION RETURNED UNSERVED (CRU) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT MARISON DIMAS COLEMAN(SUBJ DOES NOT LIVE @ ADDRESS) CITATION RETURNED UNSERVED (CRU) |
|
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
Citation BILLY COLEMAN (CONSTABLE BOX) CITATION(S) ISSUED FOR: (CIT) Vol./Book IMG, Page ML BILLY COLEMAN (CONSTABLE BOX) CITATION(S) ISSUED FOR: (CIT) |
|
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
Citation BILLY COLEMAN (RETURNED TO ATTY) CITATION(S) ISSUED FOR: (CIT) Vol./Book IMG, Page ML BILLY COLEMAN (RETURNED TO ATTY) CITATION(S) ISSUED FOR: (CIT) |
|
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
Citation MARISOL COLEMAN (CONSTABLE BOX) CITATION(S) ISSUED FOR: (CIT) Vol./Book IMG, Page ML MARISOL COLEMAN (CONSTABLE BOX) CITATION(S) ISSUED FOR: (CIT) |
|
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
Citation MARISOL COLEMAN (ATTY BOX) CITATION(S) ISSUED FOR: (CIT) Vol./Book IMG, Page ML MARISOL COLEMAN (ATTY BOX) CITATION(S) ISSUED FOR: (CIT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.