Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carrollton-Farmers Branch Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Daniel K Bearden, Jr., against Lopez, Elizabeth P, Francisco, Claudio J, Esparza, Fernando, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 362nd Judicial District Court with McFarling, Bruce Party(Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems INCJudgment: ( - Other Judgment Amt: 0.00 CASE ALREADY DISP ON DWOP 12-3 ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL(CITY-CARROLLTON DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House362nd Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion CITY-CARROLLTON MOTION TO DISMISS (MTD) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT CITY-CARROLLTON MOTION TO DISMISS (MTD) |
|
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Letter INTERVING ATTY RE:DISMISSAL ENCLOSED LETTER (LETTER) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT INTERVING ATTY RE:DISMISSAL ENCLOSED LETTER (LETTER) |
|
December 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: EDWARD LOPEZ JR RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE SENT TO (R.306) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT EDWARD LOPEZ JR RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE SENT TO (R.306) |
|
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Courts Dismissal Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer McFarling, Bruce) | |
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Jury/Jury Dismissal Setting 11-30-07 2:30PM NOTICE OF NON-JURY AND JURY DISMISSAL SETTING (NNJJD) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT 11-30-07 2:30PM NOTICE OF NON-JURY AND JURY DISMISSAL SETTING (NNJJD) |
|
May 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion CFB-ISD MOTION TO DISMISS (MTD) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT CFB-ISD MOTION TO DISMISS (MTD) |
|
May 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation returned: Delivered to: MERS INC 4-24-07 CITATION(S) RETURNED DELIVERED TO: (CRD) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT MERS INC 4-24-07 CITATION(S) RETURNED DELIVERED TO: (CRD) |
|
May 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Letter INTERVENING ATTY RE:INT ENCLOSED LETTER (LETTER) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT INTERVENING ATTY RE:INT ENCLOSED LETTER (LETTER) |
|
May 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Petition in Intervention CITY-CARROLLTON INTERVENTION (INTR) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT CITY-CARROLLTON INTERVENTION (INTR) |
|
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation returned: Delivered to: FERNANDO ESPARZA 4-10-07 CITATION(S) RETURNED DELIVERED TO: (CRD) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page JLT FERNANDO ESPARZA 4-10-07 CITATION(S) RETURNED DELIVERED TO: (CRD) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.