Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Read, Bobby Lynn, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Read, Deborah Shelley, Read, Bobby Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 393rd Judicial District Court with Robison, Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2001 |
CategoryOther Family |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court House393rd Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Administrative Writ Order-Notice of Withholding (AIWH)
Date: July 28, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Robison, Douglas) Petitioner's Amended Motion to Modify Parent-Child Relationship. Petitioner's Amended Motion to Modify Parent-Child Relationship. |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Letter (or email) regarding setting/hearing/trial Party: Bowman, Wallace Party: Bowman, Wallace |
|
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Copy of final order given/mailed to all parties by OAG | |
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Administrative Writ Order-Notice of Withholding (AIWH) Administrative Writ Order-Notice of Withholding (AIWH) |
|
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Exhibits from OAG hearing filed | |
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Conine, Casey ) Order Confirming Support Arrearage for Parties: Read, Bobby Lynn Order Confirming Support Arrearage |
|
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event | OAG: IV-D Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Conine, Casey) | |
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer(s) and/or Response(s) and General Denial and General Denial |
|
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Letter (or email) regarding setting/hearing/trial from Wallace Bowman from Wallace Bowman |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.