Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
May, Matthew Vincent, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against May, Casandra Lynelle, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 367th Judicial District Court with Gabriel, Lee Converted Disposition:Party: MAY, CASANDRA LYNELLE Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT Judgment : Agreed Party(May, Casandra LynelleJudgment: (A - Agreed Judgment Amt: 0.00 FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE AGREED JUDGMENT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2005 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House367th Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Record/Copy Request Ricki Meeks Ricki Meeks |
|
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Information Sheet STATE DISBURSEMENT UNIT INFORMATION FORM (SDU) STATE DISBURSEMENT UNIT INFORMATION FORM (SDU) |
|
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy of Final Order Sent to Resp or Defendant(s) CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT/DECREE SENT TO RESPONDENT(S) (CCSR) CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT/DECREE SENT TO RESPONDENT(S) (CCSR) |
|
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics FORM VS-165 SENT TO BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS (VS) FORM VS-165 SENT TO BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS (VS) |
|
March 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
Employer's Order to Withhold Earnings FROM EARNINGS FOR CHILD SUPPORT EMPLOYER'S ORDER TO WITHHOLD INCOME (EMP) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page SGB FROM EARNINGS FOR CHILD SUPPORT EMPLOYER'S ORDER TO WITHHOLD INCOME (EMP) |
|
January 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Waiver CASANDRA L MAY WAIVER OF SERVICE (WOS) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page SGB CASANDRA L MAY WAIVER OF SERVICE (WOS) |
|
December 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Opening Filing Event Case Filing Case Filing |
|
December 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Original Petition for Divorce BROUGHT BY MATTHEW V MAY ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE (OPD) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page SGB BROUGHT BY MATTHEW V MAY ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE (OPD) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.