Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jp Morgan Chase Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Stephen P Melinder, Jr., against Wilson, Myriam, Wilson, Destry L, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 367th Judicial District Court with Gabriel, Lee Converted Disposition:Party: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Judgment : Other Party(JP Morgan Chase BankJudgment: (O - Other Judgment Amt: 0.00 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryDebt/Contract: Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House367th Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Courts Dismissal Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Gabriel, Lee) | |
April 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion for Non-Suit WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION FOR NON-SUIT (MN/S) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page SGB WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION FOR NON-SUIT (MN/S) |
|
April 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Jury/Jury Dismissal Setting NOTICE OF NON-JURY AND JURY DISMISSAL SETTING (NNJJD) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page SGB NOTICE OF NON-JURY AND JURY DISMISSAL SETTING (NNJJD) |
|
February 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice TO: DESTRY WILSON AND MYRIAM WILSON; RE: FORECLOSURE NOTICE (NOT) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page SGB TO: DESTRY WILSON AND MYRIAM WILSON; RE: FORECLOSURE NOTICE (NOT) |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Bill of Costs (CIVIL) RE: JUDICIAL SERVICE FEE; SHORT $37.00 (SENT FAX COPY TO ATTY OF RECORD) BILL OF COSTS (BOC) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page SGB (CIVIL) RE: JUDICIAL SERVICE FEE; SHORT $37.00 (SENT FAX COPY TO ATTY OF RECORD) BILL OF COSTS (BOC) |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Opening Filing Event Case Filing Case Filing |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Application FOR ORDER FOR FORECLOSURE APPLICATION (CIVIL) (APP-C) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page SGB FOR ORDER FOR FORECLOSURE APPLICATION (CIVIL) (APP-C) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.