Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nix, David F., Nix, Sharon E., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Duane L. Coker, against Grant, Tara J., in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 393rd Judicial District Court with Isaacks, Vicki presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2002 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House393rd Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
EXHIBITS DESTROYED (EXD) Exhibits destroyed EXHIBITS DESTROYED (EXD) |
|
April 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Court reporter's exhibits filed 5 FOR MOVANT COURT REPORTERS EXHIBITS (CRE) 5 FOR MOVANT COURT REPORTERS EXHIBITS (CRE) |
|
March 31, 2006 | Docket Event | Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Isaacks, Vicki) Result: Case disposed | |
February 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice OF STATUS CONFERENCE NOTICE (NOT) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page CP OF STATUS CONFERENCE NOTICE (NOT) |
|
December 16, 2004 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Isaacks, Vicki) Result: Settled | |
December 14, 2004 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Document(s) RULE 11 AGREEMENT (R11AG) Vol./Book IMG, Page DJC RULE 11 AGREEMENT (R11AG) |
|
December 10, 2004 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING (NOF) Notice NOTICE OF FILING (NOF) Vol./Book IMG, Page DJC |
|
December 09, 2004 | Docket Event |
Supplemental TEMPORARY ORDERS SUPPLEMENTAL (SUPP) Vol./Book IMG, Page DJC TEMPORARY ORDERS SUPPLEMENTAL (SUPP) |
|
December 03, 2004 | Docket Event |
Docket Call (8:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Isaacks, Vicki) final wk. of 12-13-04 final wk. of 12-13-04 |
|
November 08, 2004 | Docket Event | Status Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Isaacks, Vicki) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.