Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gray, Mark Richard, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Pittman, Cynthia, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 211th Judicial District Court with Vick, Phillip O. Converted Disposition:Party: PITTMAN, CYNTHIA Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT Judgment : Agreed Party(Pittman, CynthiaJudgment: (A - Agreed AGREED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE AGREED JUDGMENT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2002 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House211th Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Amended QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER PARKLAND SUPPLEMENTAL RETIREMENT PLAN (PARKLAND SUPPLEMENTAL RETIREMENT PLAN) AMENDED (AMEND) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER PARKLAND SUPPLEMENTAL RETIREMENT PLAN (PARKLAND SUPPLEMENTAL RETIREMENT PLAN) AMENDED (AMEND) |
|
November 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order DALLAS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT RETIREMENT INCOME PLAN QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (QDRO) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page CP DALLAS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT RETIREMENT INCOME PLAN QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (QDRO) |
|
August 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
Returned and filed green card for certified mail sent to: TO MEDICAL CENTER OF LANCASTER - SIGNED BY JULIE BROWN ON 8/16/04 RETURNED AND FILED GREEN CARD MAILED TO: (RFG) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page CP TO MEDICAL CENTER OF LANCASTER - SIGNED BY JULIE BROWN ON 8/16/04 RETURNED AND FILED GREEN CARD MAILED TO: (RFG) |
|
August 13, 2004 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Cert. of Notice to Employer of Order Withholding TO MEDICAL CENTER OF LANCASTER, CERT MAIL NO. 7104 2230 1690 1865 9987 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE TO EMPLOYER OF ORDER WITHHOLDING (CCOWE) Page SRA TO MEDICAL CENTER OF LANCASTER, CERT MAIL NO. 7104 2230 1690 1865 9987 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE TO EMPLOYER OF ORDER WITHHOLDING (CCOWE) |
|
April 20, 2004 | Docket Event |
Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics FORM VS-165 SENT TO BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS (VS) FORM VS-165 SENT TO BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS (VS) |
|
April 20, 2004 | Docket Event |
ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (O/N) Order/Notice to Withhold Income For Child Support ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (O/N) Vol./Book IMAGED, Page SC |
|
April 20, 2004 | Docket Event |
Information Sheet FOR SDU CHILD SUPPORT ACCOUNT INFORMATION SHEET (INF) Vol./Book IMAGED, Page SC FOR SDU CHILD SUPPORT ACCOUNT INFORMATION SHEET (INF) |
|
February 18, 2004 | Docket Event |
Mediator's REPORT OF MEDIATOR (ROM) REPORT OF MEDIATOR (ROM) |
|
February 09, 2004 | Docket Event |
Settlement Agreement MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (MSA) Vol./Book IMAGED, Page SC MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (MSA) |
|
October 23, 2003 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order TO MEDIATE AGREED ORDER (AO) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page FK TO MEDIATE AGREED ORDER (AO) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.