Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lopez, Pedro T., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lopez, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 393rd Judicial District Court with Isaacks, Vicki presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2001 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House393rd Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2002 | Docket Event |
Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics FORM VS-165 SENT TO BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS (VS) FORM VS-165 SENT TO BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS (VS) |
|
June 10, 2002 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy of Final Order Sent to Resp or Defendant(s) CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT/DECREE SENT TO RESPONDENT(S) (CCSR) CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT/DECREE SENT TO RESPONDENT(S) (CCSR) |
|
June 06, 2002 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Isaacks, Vicki) | |
May 30, 2002 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing RETURNED SERVED 4/30/02 TO MARIA LOPEZ NOTICE OF HEARING (NOH) Vol./Book IMAGED, Page ACE RETURNED SERVED 4/30/02 TO MARIA LOPEZ NOTICE OF HEARING (NOH) |
|
April 18, 2002 | Docket Event |
Notice Name: LOPEZ, MARIA 2001-61463-393 IN THE MATTER OF THE MARRIAGE OF PEDRO T. LOPEZ AND MARIA LOPEZ AND IN THE INTEREST OF CYNTHIA CRISTIN LOPEZ AND MICHAEL LOPEZ Type: NOT County: Denton Authority: District Clerk Status: N Return: District Clerk LOPEZ, MARIA Unserved Serving Method Certified Mail Name: LOPEZ, MARIA 2001-61463-393 IN THE MATTER OF THE MARRIAGE OF PEDRO T. LOPEZ AND MARIA LOPEZ AND IN THE INTEREST OF CYNTHIA CRISTIN LOPEZ AND MICHAEL LOPEZ Type: NOT County: Denton Authority: District Clerk Status: N Return: District Clerk |
|
April 18, 2002 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING (NOH) Notice of Hearing NOTICE OF HEARING (NOH) Vol./Book IMAGED, Page ACE |
|
April 18, 2002 | Docket Event |
Filed document Service Event (NOTICE) Name: LOPEZ, MARIA Service Event (NOTICE) Name: LOPEZ, MARIA |
|
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event |
Original Answer RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER (ROA) Vol./Book IMAGED, Page ACE RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER (ROA) |
|
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event |
Counter Petition/Claim FOR DIVORCE ORIGINAL COUNTER-PETITION (OCP) Vol./Book IMAGED, Page ACE FOR DIVORCE ORIGINAL COUNTER-PETITION (OCP) |
|
December 20, 2001 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE (OPD) Original Petition for Divorce ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE (OPD) Vol./Book IMAGED, Page ACE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.