Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Strenger, Dana Denese, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Robin K. Barry, against Strenger, Jeffrey Alan, represented by Gary A. Kollmeier, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 211th Judicial District Court with N004496969 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2001 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House211th Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CHILD SUPPORT LEIN - DENTON COUNTY NOTICE (NOT) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page DLR OF CHILD SUPPORT LEIN - DENTON COUNTY NOTICE (NOT) |
|
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of AG as necessary party and change of payee NOTICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL AS NECESSARY PARTY AND CHANGE OF PAYEE (NAGNP) Vol./Book IMG, Page AM NOTICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL AS NECESSARY PARTY AND CHANGE OF PAYEE (NAGNP) |
|
September 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Amended Order or Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support COMFORCE TELECOM INC AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (AM/OW) Vol./Book IMG, Page LE COMFORCE TELECOM INC AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (AM/OW) |
|
September 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Administrative Writ of Withholding COMFORCE TELECOM INC NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE WRIT OF WITHHOLDING (NOA.WOW) Vol./Book IMG, Page LE COMFORCE TELECOM INC NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE WRIT OF WITHHOLDING (NOA.WOW) |
|
June 06, 2003 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PLACE OF PAYMENT TO STATE DISBURSEMENT UNIT (NPP) Notice of Place of Payment to State Disbursement Unit NOTICE OF PLACE OF PAYMENT TO STATE DISBURSEMENT UNIT (NPP) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page CP |
|
May 16, 2002 | Docket Event |
Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics FORM VS-165 SENT TO BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS (VS) FORM VS-165 SENT TO BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS (VS) |
|
May 16, 2002 | Docket Event |
Employer's Order to Withhold Earnings EMPLOYERS ORDER TO WITHHOLD EARNINGS FOR CHILD SUPPORT (EO) Vol./Book IMAGED, Page SC EMPLOYERS ORDER TO WITHHOLD EARNINGS FOR CHILD SUPPORT (EO) |
|
May 16, 2002 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Shipman, L. Dee) | |
April 16, 2002 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS (MT/O) Motion for Temporary Orders MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS (MT/O) Vol./Book IMAGED, Page SC |
|
March 26, 2002 | Docket Event |
Original Answer TO PETITIONER'S ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER (ROANSW) Vol./Book IMAGED, Page MH TO PETITIONER'S ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER (ROANSW) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.