Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
The City Of Lewisville, Texas, The County Of Denton, Texas, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Gilbert T. Bragg, Mark A Burroughs, against Beebe Electric, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 367th Judicial District Court with Barnes, Margaret E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarnes, Margaret E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2020 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House367th Judicial District Court |
Order Transferring to the 431st Judicial District Court
Date: January 15, 2021Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: January 06, 2021Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: January 05, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 04, 2021Request for Issuance of
Date: October 07, 2020Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: October 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Issuance returned Citation By Certified Mail (Kimberli Ann McGee) Party: McGee, Kimberli Ann Citation By Certified Mail (Kimberli Ann McGee) |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Transferring to the 431st Judicial District Court | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Beebe Electric, Inc. Party: Comptroller Of Public Accounts Of Texas Party: McGee, Allan Roy Party: McGee, Kimberli Ann Party: Texas Workforce Commission Party: The City Of Lewisville, Texas Party: The County Of Denton, Texas Party: The National Bank Of Texas At Fort Worth Party: Beebe Electric, Inc.Party: Comptroller Of Public Accounts Of TexasParty: McGee, Allan RoyParty: McGee, Kimberli AnnParty: Texas Workforce CommissionParty: The City Of Lewisville, TexasParty: The County Of Denton, TexasParty: The National Bank Of Texas At Fort Worth |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Barnes, Margaret E. ) Order Of Dismissal for Parties: Beebe Electric, Inc. for Parties: Comptroller Of Public Accounts Of Texas for Parties: McGee, Allan Roy for Parties: McGee, Kimberli Ann for Parties: Texas Workforce Commission for Parties: The City Of Lewisville, Texas for Parties: The County Of Denton, Texas for Parties: The National Bank Of Texas At Fort Worth Order Of Dismissal |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: The County Of Denton, Texas Party: The County Of Denton, Texas |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Issuance returned Citation (Beebe Electric, Inc.) Party: Beebe Electric, Inc. Citation (Beebe Electric, Inc.) |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Citation (Texas Workforce Commission) Party: Texas Workforce Commission Citation (Texas Workforce Commission) |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Citation (Comptroller Of Public Accounts Of Texas) Party: Comptroller Of Public Accounts Of Texas Citation (Comptroller Of Public Accounts Of Texas) |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Citation (The National Bank Of Texas At Fort Worth) Party: The National Bank Of Texas At Fort Worth Citation (The National Bank Of Texas At Fort Worth) |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Citation By Certified Mail (Allan Roy McGee) *See Service Tab Comments* Party: McGee, Allan Roy Citation By Certified Mail (Allan Roy McGee) *See Service Tab Comments* |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.