Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lee, Melvin Oran, Iii, Lee, Nadya  Clarke, Nadya, filed a(n) Adoption - Family case represented by Marianela Flores, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 467th Judicial District Court with Jones, Derbha H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJones, Derbha H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2020 |
CategoryAdoption - Child |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeAdoption |
Filing Court House467th Judicial District Court |
Order Transferring to the 467th Judicial District Court
Date: January 15, 2021Request for Issuance of
Date: October 05, 2020Original Petition/Application
Date: September 25, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jones, Derbha H.) Set via email by M Flores on 12/21/20; Carried over from 3/10/21. 03/10/2021 Reset by Court to 03/10/2021 03/10/2021 Reset by Court to 04/15/2021 Set via email by M Flores on 12/21/20; Carried over from 3/10/21. Judge: Jones, Derbha H. |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Attorney/Guardian ad litem (Judicial Officer: Jones, Derbha H. ) Appointed: Burkett, Cynthia For: Minor Child N.M. 20-7708-462 Appointed: Burkett, CynthiaFor: Minor Child N.M. 20-7708-462 Judge: : Jones, Derbha H. |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judicial Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Jones, Derbha H. ) Court ordered appointment of attorney ad litem; Petitioner's to pay the cost of ad litem fees; $1500 to be deposited with ad litem on or before March 19, 2021. Attorney for Petitioner to prepare order. Court ordered appointment of attorney ad litem; Petitioner's to pay the cost of ad litem fees; $1500 to be deposited with ad litem on or before March 19, 2021. Attorney for Petitioner to prepare order. Judge: : Jones, Derbha H. |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jones, Derbha H.)
Judge: Jones, Derbha H. |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Transferring to the 467th Judicial District Court | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Of Trial Of Trial |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Returned De'Drain Mitchell- Citation Party: Mitchell, De'Drain De'Drain Mitchell- Citation |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Issuance of Citation Citation |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation eserved in envelope #46884034 Requested By Lee, Melvin Oran, III, Lee, Nadya Mitchell, De'Drain Served 11/25/2020 Anticipated Method Personal Returned 12/01/2020 eserved in envelope #46884034 |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation eserved in envelope #46884034 Requested By Lee, Melvin Oran, III, Lee, Nadya Mitchell, De'Drain Unserved Anticipated Method Personal eserved in envelope #46884034 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.