Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Elegbogun, Anthony O., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Ernest O. Izedonmwen, against Elegbogun, Oluwafolake, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 393rd Judicial District Court with Robison, Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobison, Douglas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce Without Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House393rd Judicial District Court |
Original Petition for Divorce
Date: September 24, 2020Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: January 08, 2021Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: January 12, 2021Record/Copy Request
Date: January 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Elegbogun, Oluwafolake Party: Izedonmwen, Ernest O. Party: Elegbogun, OluwafolakeParty: Izedonmwen, Ernest O. |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Robison, Douglas ) Final Decree of Divorce for Parties: Elegbogun, Anthony O. for Parties: Elegbogun, Oluwafolake Final Decree of Divorce |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit(s) for Prove-Up of Agreed Divorce Filed by: Elegbogun, Anthony O. for Prove-Up of Agreed Divorce |
|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service or Citation Party: Elegbogun, Oluwafolake Party: Elegbogun, Oluwafolake |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition for Divorce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.