Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kirby Wiggins, Kari A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Wiggins, Jacky Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 367th Judicial District Court with Barnes, Margaret E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 13, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House367th Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Order or Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support (Judicial Officer: Barnes, Margaret E. ) Payor: Wiggins, Jacky Wayne Payor: Wiggins, Jacky Wayne |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Mailing returned unclaimed/undeliverable Party: Peters, Sarah Party: Peters, Sarah |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Nelson, Brett A. Party: Peters, Sarah Party: Nelson, Brett A.Party: Peters, Sarah |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Mediated (Settlement) Agreement | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Haertling, Tiffany ) Agreed Final Decree of Divorce for Parties: Kirby Wiggins, Kari A for Parties: Wiggins, Jacky Wayne Agreed Final Decree of Divorce |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judicial Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Haertling, Tiffany ) Petitioner appeared with her attorney Brett Nelson; Respondent signed decree; p/u testimony; divorce granted; decree signed; Patty Petitioner appeared with her attorney Brett Nelson; Respondent signed decree; p/u testimony; divorce granted; decree signed; Patty |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for New Trial Pass No Hearing Wanted At This Time CANCELED Motion for New Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Barnes, Margaret E.) Pass No Hearing Wanted At This Time 11/12-Set via email with SPeters and BNelson;understands that they are back up to JT 11/15-Temp. Mutual Injunction signed and set to 12/11 @ 10am |
|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Temporary Injunction (Judicial Officer: Barnes, Margaret E. ) Agreed Mutual Pending Hearing on Temporary Orders After Mediation Agreed Mutual Pending Hearing on Temporary Orders After Mediation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.