Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ruiz, Rolando Gallegos, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Haven Massey, against Shmaisani Management, Llc, represented by Michael S. Newman, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 362nd Judicial District Court with McFarling, Bruce presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
|
Filing Court House362nd Judicial District Court |
Request for Issuance of
Date: December 26, 2019Defendant's Original Answer
Date: February 18, 2020Record/Copy Request
Date: December 27, 2019Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: December 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer And Motion For Plaintiff To Compy With Texas Civil Practices & Remidies Code Section 30.0104 Party: Shmaisani Management, LLC And Motion For Plaintiff To Compy With Texas Civil Practices & Remidies Code Section 30.0104 |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Returned - Citation Party: Shmaisani Management, LLC - Citation |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Issuance of Citation Made by: Ruiz, Rolando Gallegos Citation |
|
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation eserved envelope #39508204 Shmaisani Management, LLC Served 01/27/2020 11:35 AM Anticipated Method Personal Returned 02/03/2020 1:01 PM eserved envelope #39508204 |
|
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure and Request for Disclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.