Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Assessed Costs (Cpc) filed a(n) Child Protection - Family case against Sanders, Tasha, Sanders, Jeremy, Mcgregor, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 431st Judicial District Court with Bailey, Jonathan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2019 |
CategoryChild Protection Case |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Protection |
Filing Court House431st Judicial District Court |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: January 06, 2020Application for Subpoena(s) and Subpoena(s) issued to
Date: December 30, 2019Request for Issuance of
Date: December 23, 2019Attorney Ad Litem(s)
Date: December 30, 2019Original Petition/Application
Date: December 23, 2019Request for Issuance of
Date: December 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
CPS Status Hearing Case has been disposed CANCELED CPS Status Hearing (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bailey, Jonathan) Case has been disposed set by D.A. on 1/3/20 |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Mailing returned unclaimed/undeliverable Party: McGregor, Robert Party: McGregor, Robert |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of the Court (Judicial Officer: Bailey, Jonathan ) Party: Maddock, Rosalia Party: Maddock, Rosalia |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Attorney Filed by: Maddock, Rosalia Filed by: Maddock, Rosalia |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Notice of Hearing to Robert McGregor Notice of Hearing to Robert McGregor |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Citation to Robert McGregor Citation to Robert McGregor |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Robert McGregor Party: McGregor, Robert Robert McGregor |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice: Unable to mail because of lack of address for Jeremy Sanders Party: Sanders, Jeremy Jeremy Sanders |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Tasha Sanders Party: Sanders, Tasha Tasha Sanders |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.