Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jarod & Lindsay Guier, Inc., Hw 4 Tx Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by R. Douglas Scott, against Ryan, Tony, represented by Jeffrey C. Tasker, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 211th Judicial District Court with Shanklin, Brody presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryDebt/Contract: Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House211th Judicial District Court |
Defendant's Original Answer
Date: February 03, 2020Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: December 20, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Document(s) | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Party: Ryan, Tony Party: Ryan, Tony |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Citation to Tony Ryan Citation to Tony Ryan |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Env # 39438197 Requested By HW 4 TX LLC, Jarod & Lindsay Guier, Inc. Ryan, Tony Served 01/07/2020 Anticipated Server Private Process Server Anticipated Method Personal Returned 01/16/2020 Env # 39438197 |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Rule 194 Disclosure and Request for Rule 194 Disclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.