Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Stricklen, Haskell Glen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Brown, Krista Lynne, represented by Roger M. Yale, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 362nd Judicial District Court with McFarling, Bruce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcFarling, Bruce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 26, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce Without Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House362nd Judicial District Court |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: October 04, 2019Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: October 04, 2019Motion to Enter
Date: August 30, 2019Proposed Order (will not be signed)
Date: April 04, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: April 04, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: March 29, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: March 28, 2019Objection(s) or Complaint
Date: March 28, 2019Motion
Date: February 21, 2019Proposed Order (will not be signed)
Date: February 21, 2019Order of Referral to Mediation
Date: January 03, 2019Motion
Date: December 27, 2018Motion for Continuance
Date: December 21, 2018Order Granting Motion to Withdraw/Substitute Counsel
Date: November 13, 2018Original Answer
Date: August 17, 2018Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: November 13, 2018Counter Petition/Claim
Date: July 19, 2018Respondent's Original Answer
Date: July 19, 2018Request for Issuance of
Date: July 03, 2018Original Petition for Divorce
Date: June 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enter (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McFarling, Bruce) Set by Roger Yale's office by phone on 9-4-2019 @ 11:55 Set by Roger Yale's office by phone on 9-4-2019 @ 11:55 |
|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Alexander, Timothy James Party: Rogers, John M. Party: Yale, Roger M. Party: Alexander, Timothy JamesParty: Rogers, John M.Party: Yale, Roger M. |
|
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: McFarling, Bruce ) Final Decree of Divorce for Parties: Brown, Charles A. for Parties: Brown, Jennifer C. for Parties: Brown, Krista Lynne for Parties: Kramer, Kenneth C. for Parties: Stricklen, Haskell Glen Final Decree of Divorce |
|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enter Filed by: Brown, Krista Lynne Filed by: Brown, Krista Lynne |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reporter's/Officer's Cert. of Deposition: Deposition of Haskell G. Stricklen Party: Brown, Charles A. Party: Brown, Jennifer C. Party: Kramer, Kenneth C. Haskell G. Stricklen |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reporter's/Officer's Cert. of Deposition: Deposition of Kenneth C. Kramer May 22, 2019 Party: Stricklen, Haskell Glen Kenneth C. Kramer May 22, 2019 |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reporter's/Officer's Cert. of Deposition: Deposition of Krista B. Stricklen Party: Stricklen, Haskell Glen Krista B. Stricklen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.