Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mills, Robert Scott, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Nindorf, Emily Ann, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 393rd Judicial District Court with Robison, Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce Without Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House393rd Judicial District Court |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: April 05, 2019Record/Copy Request
Date: April 05, 2019Original Petition for Divorce
Date: December 31, 2018Request for Issuance of
Date: December 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Shipman, Sherry ) Final Decree of Divorce for Parties: Mills, Robert Scott for Parties: Nindorf, Emily Ann Final Decree of Divorce |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Change Of Address Notification Party: Nindorf, Emily Ann Party: Nindorf, Emily Ann |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Citation for Emily Mills Citation for Emily Mills |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation sent to Constable Pct. 5 Mills, Emily Anne Served 01/07/2019 8:17 AM Anticipated Server Constable #5 Anticipated Method Personal Returned 01/08/2019 Serving Officer Riojas, George Serving Method Personal Delivery sent to Constable Pct. 5 |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Petition for Divorce | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Issuance of Citation Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.