Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fant, Robert Clinton, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Fant, Rachel Maura, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 442nd Judicial District Court with Haertling, Tiffany presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce Without Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House442nd Judicial District Court |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: April 16, 2019Record/Copy Request
Date: April 29, 2019Respondent's Original Answer
Date: February 20, 2019Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: April 16, 2019Original Petition for Divorce
Date: December 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Deputy Reporter Statement | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Haertling, Tiffany ) Agreed Fianl Decree of Divorce for Parties: Fant, Rachel Maura Agreed Fianl Decree of Divorce |
|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Fant, Robert Clinton Party: Fant, Robert Clinton |
|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judicial Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Haertling, Tiffany ) Petitioner signed decree; Respondent appeared; p/u testimony; divorce granted; decree signed; JR Petitioner signed decree; Respondent appeared; p/u testimony; divorce granted; decree signed; JR |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Original Answer Filed by: Fant, Rachel Maura Filed by: Fant, Rachel Maura |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service or Citation Party: Fant, Rachel Maura Party: Fant, Rachel Maura |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Change Of Address Notification Party: Fant, Robert Clinton Party: Fant, Robert Clinton |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.