Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Assessed Costs filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Hodge, Joshua Lee, Krouskup, Nicole Marie, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 367th Judicial District Court with Barnes, Margaret E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryAg - Support |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House367th Judicial District Court |
Request for Issuance of
Date: October 18, 2019Billing Statement
Date: August 01, 2019Motion/Petition To Modify
Date: October 17, 2019Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: July 31, 2019Respondent's Original Answer
Date: January 24, 2019Request for Issuance of
Date: May 14, 2019Order
Date: April 10, 2019Acknowledgement of Paternity Petition (AOPP)
Date: December 27, 2018Request for Issuance of
Date: December 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Change Of Address Notification Party: Hodge, Joshua Lee Party: Hodge, Joshua Lee |
|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Barnes, Margaret E.) 10/18-Set by GBohling from a TRO 10/18-Set by GBohling from a TRO |
|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Returned - Citation Party: Hodge, Joshua Lee - Citation |
|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Temporary Restraining Order Party: Hodge, Joshua Lee Temporary Restraining Order |
|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Issuance of TRO Made by: Krouskup, Nicole Marie TRO |
|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Put in Ira Diggs box, E28 Requested By Krouskup, Nicole Marie Hodge, Joshua Lee Served 10/21/2019 6:55 PM Returned 10/22/2019 Put in Ira Diggs box, E28 |
|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Put in Ira Diggs box at front, E28 Requested By Krouskup, Nicole Marie Hodge, Joshua Lee Served 10/21/2019 Returned 10/22/2019 Put in Ira Diggs box at front, E28 |
|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (Judicial Officer: Barnes, Margaret E. ) and Order Setting Hearing for Temporary Orders and Order Setting Hearing for Temporary Orders |
|
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion/Petition To Modify Parent-Child Relationship Parent-Child Relationship |
|
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Billing Statement Sent to: Hodge, Joshua Lee Sent to: Hodge, Joshua Lee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.