Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Assessed Costs filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Lopez, Norma, Ibarra, Jose Guadalupe, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 393rd Judicial District Court with Robison, Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryAg - Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court House393rd Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Judge, Not Required ) Notice of Nonsuit for Parties: Ibarra, Jose Guadalupe for Parties: Lopez, Norma for Parties: Office Of The Attorney General, Child Support Division Notice of Nonsuit |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
OAG: IV-D Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jenkins, Cherami Joann) Set by the AG Set by the AG |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
OAG: IV-D Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jenkins, Cherami Joann) Set by the AG Set by the AG |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Returned of Citation Party: Lopez, Norma of Citation |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Citation efiled Requested By Office Of The Attorney General, Child Support Division Lopez, Norma Served 01/30/2019 6:23 PM Anticipated Method Private Process Server Returned 01/31/2019 11:17 AM Ibarra, Jose Guadalupe Unserved efiled |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Acknowledge of Paternity and Paternity Test (PAOP) Petition to Establish the Parent-Child Relationship and Petition in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship(AOP) Filed by:: Office Of The Attorney General, Child Support Division Petition to Establish the Parent-Child Relationship and Petition in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship(AOP) |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Issuance of Citation Made by: Office Of The Attorney General, Child Support Division Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.