Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Smith, Cristi, Smith, Jason, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case represented by Gregory C. Goline, against Caverly, Cristina, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 393rd Judicial District Court with Robison, Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryCustody Or Visitation |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Filing Court House393rd Judicial District Court |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (partial case closing)
Date: March 05, 2019Order
Date: September 23, 2019Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: July 02, 2019Request for Issuance of
Date: February 20, 2019Motion for Entry
Date: April 11, 2019Order on Motion
Date: February 13, 2019Record/Copy Request
Date: January 16, 2019Motion
Date: February 06, 2019Motion
Date: January 28, 2019Request for Issuance of
Date: January 16, 2019Proposed Order (will not be signed)
Date: January 15, 2019Motion
Date: January 15, 2019Request for Issuance of
Date: January 03, 2019Original Petition/Application
Date: December 27, 2018First Amended
Date: December 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Robison, Douglas ) Appointing Evaluator to Perform Adoption Evaluation Appointing Evaluator to Perform Adoption Evaluation |
|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Attorney/Guardian ad litem (Judicial Officer: Robison, Douglas ) Appointed: Hill, Brent For: Minor Child B.I.C. 18-11779-393 Appointed: Hill, BrentFor: Minor Child B.I.C. 18-11779-393 |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Robison, Douglas ) Interlocutory Order of Termination for Parties: Caverly, Cristina for Parties: Smith, Cristi for Parties: Smith, Jason Interlocutory Order of Termination |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice: Unable to mail because of lack of address for Party: Caverly, Cristina Party: Caverly, Cristina |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Voluntary Relinquishment of Parental Rights for Christina Caverly for Christina Caverly |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judicial Docket Entry 05.02.2019-Entered T.O. as consistent with ruling. 05.02.2019-Entered T.O. as consistent with ruling. |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders (Judicial Officer: Robison, Douglas ) | |
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robison, Douglas) 4-11-19 set by Luisa Feliz 1 hour or less. 4-11-19 set by Luisa Feliz 1 hour or less. |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Entry of Temporary Orders Filed by: Smith, Cristi Filed by: Smith, Jason of Temporary Orders |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.