Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Assessed Costs filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 362nd Judicial District Court with Shanklin, Brody presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategorySeizure / Forfeiture Of Property |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House362nd Judicial District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Percy, Dion Party: Percy, Dion |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Shanklin, Brody ) Default Judgment for Parties: Percy, Dion for Parties: State of Texas Default Judgment |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address Party: Percy, Dion Party: Percy, Dion |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Citation Party: Percy, Dion Citation |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation sent to Pct.3 by interoffice mail Percy, Dion Served 01/22/2019 9:13 AM Anticipated Method Personal Returned 01/24/2019 Serving Officer Bagley, Tony Serving Method Personal Delivery sent to Pct.3 by interoffice mail |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Issuance of Citation Citation |
|
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Issuance returned Citation Party: Percy, Dion Citation |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Citation Sent to Constable PCT # 3 by Interoffice Mail Percy, Dion Returned Unserved 01/04/2019 Anticipated Server Constable #3 Anticipated Method Personal Returned 01/04/2019 Sent to Constable PCT # 3 by Interoffice Mail |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Issuance of Citation Made by: State of Texas Citation |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Notice of Seizure and Intended Forfeiture |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.