Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Payne, Lindsay Joy, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Jasmin L. Dodson, against Lutz, Erik Christian, represented by Vanessa J. Sheppard, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 362nd Judicial District Court with McFarling, Bruce presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2016 |
CategoryRegister Foreign Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court House362nd Judicial District Court |
Mediator's Report to Court
Date: July 27, 2020First Amended (Original) Petition
Date: July 08, 2020Opposition
Date: March 23, 2020Scheduling Order
Date: June 10, 2020Counter Petition/Claim
Date: June 09, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: April 21, 2020Mediated (Settlement) Agreement
Date: July 27, 2020Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from:
Date: March 05, 2020Amended Answer
Date: February 28, 2020Letter from Court sent to
Date: February 21, 2020Proposed Order (will not be signed)
Date: March 04, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: February 13, 2020Objection(s) or Complaint
Date: December 05, 2019Motion/Petition To Modify
Date: January 02, 2020Mediator's Report to Court
Date: December 19, 2019Objection(s) or Complaint
Date: December 05, 2019Proposed Order (will not be signed)
Date: February 11, 2020Respondent's Original Answer
Date: January 16, 2020Proposed Order (will not be signed)
Date: November 22, 2019Motion for Sanctions
Date: November 21, 2019Objection(s) or Complaint
Date: November 15, 2019Motion
Date: October 28, 2019Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from:
Date: September 12, 2019Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from:
Date: August 02, 2019Proposed Order (will not be signed)
Date: June 03, 2019Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from:
Date: December 11, 2018Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from:
Date: July 16, 2018Request for Issuance of
Date: June 07, 2018Original Petition/Application
Date: June 07, 2018Record/Copy Request
Date: May 22, 2018Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: August 11, 2017Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: August 15, 2017Mediated (Settlement) Agreement
Date: March 22, 2017Mediator's Report to Court
Date: March 22, 2017Order of Referral to Mediation
Date: February 17, 2017Request for Issuance of
Date: September 09, 2016Request for Issuance of
Date: May 17, 2016Motion/Petition To Modify
Date: August 10, 2016Proposed Order (will not be signed)
Date: August 12, 2016Letter
Date: April 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McFarling, Bruce) on Motion to Modify Docket Call 7-31-2020 Case set from Scheduling Order #1 Case set from Docket Call for 7-31-2020 on Motion to Modify Docket Call 7-31-2020 Case set from Scheduling Order #1 Case set from Docket Call for 7-31-2020 |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Call Pass No Hearing Wanted At This Time CANCELED Docket Call (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McFarling, Bruce) Pass No Hearing Wanted At This Time Final Hearing on Motion to Modify 8-10-2020 Case set from Scheduling Order |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Mediator's Report to Court Agreement reached Agreement reached |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Mediated (Settlement) Agreement (Partial) (Partial) |
|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
First Amended Counterpetition to Modify Parent-Child Relationship Party: Lutz, Erik Christian Counterpetition to Modify Parent-Child Relationship |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Parenting Plan | |
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
First Amended (Original) Petition to Modify Parent-Child Relationship Party: Payne, Lindsay Joy to Modify Parent-Child Relationship |
|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Party: Payne, Lindsay Joy Party: Payne, Lindsay Joy |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing Reset CANCELED Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McFarling, Bruce) Reset on M:Modify Docket Call 6-12-2020 Set by Jasmin Dodson via email on 4-13-2020 (1/2 DAY) |
|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Call Reset CANCELED Docket Call (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McFarling, Bruce) Reset Final Hearing on M:Modify 6-22-2020 (1/2 DAY) Set by Jasmin Dodson via email on 4-13-2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.