Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carew, Cynthia Lee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 367th Judicial District Court with Barnes, Margaret E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce Without Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House367th Judicial District Court |
Record/Copy Request
Date: October 18, 2019Record/Copy Request
Date: January 17, 2018Original Petition for Divorce
Date: December 30, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Final Decree sent to Party: Carew, Edward Steven Party: Carew, Edward Steven |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Haertling, Tiffany ) (Final Decree of Divorce - Agreed) for Parties: Carew, Cynthia Lee for Parties: Carew, Edward Steven (Final Decree of Divorce - Agreed) |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous (Warranty Deed) Party: Carew, Cynthia Lee (Warranty Deed) |
|
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Original Answer Filed by: Carew, Edward Steven Filed by: Carew, Edward Steven |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Original Petition for Divorce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.