Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mccarty, Amy, Mccarty, Donald, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by D. Kimberli Wallace, against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., represented by Kate Rawlings, Marc D Cabrera, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 158th Judicial District Court with Burgess, Steve presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
|
Filing Court House158th Judicial District Court |
Unopposed Motion
Date: June 05, 2015Proposed Order - printed for submission to the Court by:
Date: June 05, 2015Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: February 06, 2015Defendant's Original Answer
Date: February 02, 2015Request for Issuance of
Date: December 31, 2014Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: December 31, 2014Proposed Order - printed for submission to the Court by:
Date: December 31, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Burgess, Steve ) (Granting motion for return of bond) (Granting motion for return of bond) |
|
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Unopposed Motion for Return of Bond Filed by: McCarty, Amy Filed by: Mccarty, Donald for Return of Bond |
|
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - printed for submission to the Court by: Court Coordinator Court Coordinator |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Wallace, D. Kimberli Party: Wallace, D. Kimberli |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Judge, Not Required ) Notice of Removal from State Court for Parties: McCarty, Amy for Parties: Mccarty, Donald for Parties: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Notice of Removal from State Court |
|
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Defendant's Original Answer | |
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Hearing 1-2-15 Set by: Osulman - 30 mins. requested Temporary Restraining Order Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Burgess, Steve) 1-2-15 Set by: Osulman - 30 mins. requested |
|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Temporary Restraining Order Party: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Temporary Restraining Order |
|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Citation Party: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.