Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Assessed Costs filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case represented by Gerad T. Rosso, against Olvera, Basilio Ben, Iii, Redfearn, Mary Renee, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 158th Judicial District Court with Burgess, Steve presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCustody Or Visitation |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Filing Court House158th Judicial District Court |
Proposed Order - printed for submission to the Court by:
Date: August 07, 2015Proposed Order - printed for submission to the Court by:
Date: May 15, 2015Subpoena(s) issued by attorney
Date: May 05, 2015Counter Petition/Claim
Date: May 05, 2015Subpoena(s) issued by attorney
Date: February 27, 2015Respondent's Original Answer
Date: May 05, 2015Motion for Continuance
Date: February 19, 2015Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from:
Date: February 25, 2015Motion to Consolidate
Date: February 25, 2015Motion to Consolidate
Date: February 03, 2015Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 17, 2015Request
Date: January 07, 2015Original Petition/Application
Date: December 31, 2014Request for Issuance of
Date: December 31, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion To Withdraw Pass No Hearing Wanted At This Time CANCELED Motion To Withdraw (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Burgess, Steve) Pass No Hearing Wanted At This Time Rachel 8/7/15 |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion To Withdraw (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Burgess, Steve) Set by Biles on 7/21/15. Set by Biles on 7/21/15. |
|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Withdraw/Substitute Counsel (Judicial Officer: Burgess, Steve ) (granting) Attorney: Rachel, Megan B. For Party: Redfearn, Mary Renee (granting) |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - printed for submission to the Court by: Court Coordinator Court Coordinator |
|
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Denying (Judicial Officer: Burgess, Steve ) Motion to Dismiss Original Petition in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss Original Petition in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship for Lack of Jurisdiction |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - printed for submission to the Court by: Court Coordinator Court Coordinator |
|
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Burgess, Steve ) Order Consolidating Suits (to cause number 98-20391-158) for Parties: Office Of The Attorney General, Child Support Division for Parties: Olvera, Basilio Ben, III for Parties: Redfearn, Mary Renee Order Consolidating Suits (to cause number 98-20391-158) |
|
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judicial Docket Entry Temporary Orders; JMC, with mom having the right to establish primary residence in Denton County or Taylor County; Father Ordered to pay guideline support at the 30% guideline amount per the family code, with language that this Order covers support for the other two children; Mom has, with consultation, the exclusive right to make health, psychological and educational decisions, with all other rights and duties to be exercised independently after consultation; Mom is awarded possession of the child on Mother's Day Weekend, beginning at 6:00pm Friday and concluding by 8:00pm Sunday; Father is Ordered to maintain health insurance on Emerie, unless he chooses to place her on CHIPS or Medicaid, in which case he is ordered to reimburse the State of Texas $113/month; Father shall have Standard Visitation, with the exception of Summer 2015, where he shall have possession of all three children during the month of July, with pickup of the children July 1, by 6:00pm and drop-off of the children by July 31, 2015 at 8:00pm. Mom shall take possession of Emerie beginning at 6:00pm on the first Saturday after the child is released from school for the Summer Break. Temporary Orders; JMC, with mom having the right to establish primary residence in Denton County or Taylor County; Father Ordered to pay guideline support at the 30% guideline amount per the family code, with language that this Order covers support for the other two children; Mom has, with consultation, the exclusive right to make health, psychological and educational decisions, with all other rights and duties to be exercised independently after consultation; Mom is awarded possession of the child on Mother's Day Weekend, beginning at 6:00pm Friday and concluding by 8:00pm Sunday; Father is Ordered to maintain health insurance on Emerie, unless he chooses to place her on CHIPS or Medicaid, in which case he is ordered to reimburse the State of Texas $113/month; Father shall have Standard Visitation, with the exception of Summer 2015, where he shall have possession of all three children during the month of July, with pickup of the children July 1, by 6:00pm and drop-off of the children by July 31, 2015 at 8:00pm. Mom shall take possession of Emerie beginning at 6:00pm on the first Saturday after the child is released from school for the Summer Break. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.