Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wakefield, Keith William, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Wakefield, Alisa Collette, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 362nd Judicial District Court with Shipman, Sherry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House362nd Judicial District Court |
Original Petition for Divorce
Date: December 30, 2014Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: December 30, 2015Order
Date: December 30, 2015Agreement Incident to Divorce
Date: December 30, 2015Respondent's Original Answer
Date: February 17, 2015Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: December 30, 2015Qualified Domestic Relations Order
Date: December 30, 2015Counter Petition/Claim
Date: February 17, 2015Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from:
Date: August 04, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Holland, Mary Fellmeth Party: Simpson, Nora Jane Party: Holland, Mary FellmethParty: Simpson, Nora Jane |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Shipman, Sherry ) of Income Withholding for Spousal Maintenance of Income Withholding for Spousal Maintenance |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Agreement Incident to Divorce | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Shipman, Sherry ) Final Decree of Divorce for Parties: Wakefield, Alisa Collette for Parties: Wakefield, Keith William Final Decree of Divorce |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order (Judicial Officer: Shipman, Sherry ) Pilot Retirement Benefit Program Employee: Wakefield, Keith William Pilot Retirement Benefit Program |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judicial Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Shipman, Sherry ) Proveup of final decree of divorce by H w/atty; QDRA and spousal mtc WH order signed; divorce granted - SLS/MN Proveup of final decree of divorce by H w/atty; QDRA and spousal mtc WH order signed; divorce granted - SLS/MN |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from: Nora Simpson Nora Simpson |
|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Original Answer Filed by: Wakefield, Alisa Collette Filed by: Wakefield, Alisa Collette |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.