Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Assessed Costs filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Marc D. Mcpeak, against Kolodetsky, Kenna Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 462nd Judicial District Court with Breading, Lee Ann presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House462nd Judicial District Court |
Motion/Petition for Enforcement
Date: July 17, 2018Response(s)
Date: September 21, 2018Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from:
Date: September 24, 2018Order to Appear and Show Cause
Date: July 27, 2018Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: March 05, 2018Proposed Order (will not be signed)
Date: January 19, 2018Order to Appear and Show Cause
Date: January 22, 2018Proposed Order - printed for submission to the Court by:
Date: January 18, 2018Proposed Order (will not be signed)
Date: March 07, 2018Final Order/Judgment/Decree (partial case closing)
Date: April 27, 2018Order to Appear and Show Cause
Date: January 22, 2018Order Granting Motion to Withdraw/Substitute Counsel
Date: March 07, 2018Order
Date: April 27, 2018Motion/Petition for Enforcement
Date: January 18, 2018Amended Order
Date: September 08, 2017Record/Copy Request
Date: December 21, 2017Proposed Order (will not be signed)
Date: September 08, 2017Release Order
Date: September 08, 2017Application
Date: August 25, 2017Proposed Order (will not be signed)
Date: August 17, 2017Motion for Continuance
Date: August 15, 2017Order Granting Motion to Withdraw/Substitute Counsel
Date: August 10, 2017Record/Copy Request
Date: July 31, 2017Finding Regarding Indigence and Order Appointing Counsel
Date: July 28, 2017Final Order/Judgment/Decree (partial case closing)
Date: July 21, 2017Application for Court Appointed Attorney and Financial Affid
Date: July 28, 2017Record/Copy Request
Date: July 27, 2017Motion for Withdrawal/Substitution of Counsel/Attorney
Date: July 25, 2017Respondent's Original Answer
Date: June 22, 2017Memorandum of Orders
Date: July 17, 2017Final Order/Judgment/Decree (partial case closing)
Date: June 28, 2017Letter from Court sent to
Date: July 17, 2017Request for Issuance of
Date: June 20, 2017Counter Petition/Claim
Date: June 15, 2017Record/Copy Request
Date: June 16, 2017Defendant's Original Answer
Date: May 01, 2017Request for Issuance of
Date: March 29, 2017Motion to Confirm CS Arrearage/or to Reduce Judgment (MRED)
Date: March 29, 2017Motion/Petition To Modify
Date: October 21, 2016Motion for Non-Suit
Date: November 23, 2016Record/Copy Request
Date: October 20, 2016Record/Copy Request
Date: July 27, 2016Order on Motion
Date: June 10, 2016Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: June 10, 2016Order Granting Motion to Withdraw/Substitute Counsel
Date: June 02, 2016Motion for Withdrawal/Substitution of Counsel/Attorney
Date: June 02, 2016Final Order/Judgment/Decree (partial case closing)
Date: May 10, 2016Mediated (Settlement) Agreement
Date: May 03, 2016Order of Referral to Mediation
Date: April 20, 2016Order to Appear and Show Cause
Date: April 01, 2016Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from:
Date: March 11, 2016Motion/Petition for Enforcement
Date: February 16, 2016Subpoena(s) issued by attorney
Date: February 08, 2016Subpoena(s) issued by attorney
Date: February 09, 2016Counter Petition/Claim
Date: December 23, 2015Motion
Date: January 11, 2016Original Answer
Date: December 21, 2015Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from:
Date: September 10, 2015Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from:
Date: September 10, 2015Order Granting Motion to Withdraw/Substitute Counsel
Date: August 25, 2015Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: August 19, 2015Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from:
Date: June 30, 2015Order of Referral to Mediation
Date: May 05, 2015Mediator's Report to Court
Date: June 01, 2015Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from:
Date: March 30, 2015Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: February 17, 2015Motion
Date: February 27, 2015Respondent's Original Answer
Date: January 21, 2015Motion
Date: January 21, 2015Subpoena(s) issued by attorney
Date: January 05, 2015Letter
Date: January 07, 2015Subpoena(s) issued by attorney
Date: January 05, 2015Request for Issuance of
Date: December 29, 2014Original Petition for Divorce
Date: December 29, 2014Proposed Order (will not be signed)
Date: December 29, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
OAG: IV-D Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jenkins, Cherami Joann) Set by the AG Set by the AG |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Associate Judge's Order | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
OAG: IV-D Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jenkins, Cherami Joann) Set by the AG Set by the AG |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Appearance IV-D Court By: Baish, Joshua Andrew By: Baish, Joshua Andrew |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Answer To Suit for Modification of Support Order and Motion to Confirm Support Arrearage Party: Kolodetsky, Kenna Michelle To Suit for Modification of Support Order and Motion to Confirm Support Arrearage |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Original Answer in Suit for Modification of Support Order Filed by: Baish, Joshua Andrew in Suit for Modification of Support Order |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Citation Party: Kolodetsky, Kenna Michelle Citation |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Party: Baish, Joshua Andrew Party: Baish, Joshua Andrew |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation efiled Requested By Office Of The Attorney General, Child Support Division Kolodetsky, Kenna Michelle Served 01/09/2020 Returned 01/24/2020 Baish, Joshua Andrew Served 12/26/2019 3:06 PM Returned 12/30/2019 Serving Officer Debus, Eric Serving Method Personal Service efiled |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.