Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Parker, Jennifer Irene, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Parker, Michael Larry, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 431st Judicial District Court with Bailey, Jonathan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House431st Judicial District Court |
Letter
Date: August 28, 2018Request for Issuance of
Date: October 18, 2017Record/Copy Request
Date: May 30, 2017Order
Date: October 11, 2017Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: September 20, 2017Scheduling Order
Date: August 15, 2017Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from:
Date: November 07, 2016Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: September 20, 2017Request for BVS and/or SDU forms sent to
Date: September 20, 2017Motion/Petition To Modify
Date: September 13, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter to Attorney General with Orders Letter Letter to Attorney General with Orders Party: Parker, Michael Larry Party: Tackett, Brian K. |
|
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Signature Confirmation Page for Certified Mailer to Texas Woman's University to Texas Woman's University |
|
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing Case has been disposed CANCELED Final Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bailey, Jonathan) Case has been disposed set by DWOP S/O to be entered by 8/18/17; 1/2 day |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Cert. of Notice to Employer of Order Withholding to Texas Woman's University to Texas Woman's University |
|
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Issuance of Withholding Order to Employer Withholding Order to Employer |
|
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Bailey, Jonathan ) Terminating Order for Withholding Terminating Order for Withholding |
|
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Record of Support form sent by email or fax to the SDU Record of Support form sent by email or fax to the SDU |
|
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter for fax from Brian Tacket for fax from Brian Tacket |
|
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Bailey, Jonathan ) Order in Suit to Modify Parent Child Relationship for Parties: Parker, Jennifer Irene for Parties: Parker, Michael Larry Order in Suit to Modify Parent Child Relationship |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.