Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Assessed Costs filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Connell, Francis A., in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 442nd Judicial District Court with Haertling, Tiffany presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2014 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court House442nd Judicial District Court |
Order Transferring to the 442nd Judicial District Court
Date: February 02, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Connell, Francis A. Party: Hundley, Tracy L. Party: Connell, Francis A.Party: Hundley, Tracy L. |
|
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Haertling, Tiffany ) Order of Dismissal for Parties: Connell, Francis A. for Parties: Hundley, Tracy L. Order of Dismissal |
|
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Courts Dismissal Hearing (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Haertling, Tiffany) set by 442nd Admin on 07/27/15 set by 442nd Admin on 07/27/15 |
|
July 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Filed by: Hundley, Tracy L. Filed by: Hundley, Tracy L. |
|
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Transferring to the 442nd Judicial District Court | |
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Protective Order Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Shipman, L. Dee) | |
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mailing returned unclaimed/undeliverable (Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order to Tobacco House) (Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order to Tobacco House) |
|
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Returned (Protective Order Notice to Francis A Connell) (Protective Order Notice to Francis A Connell) |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Notice sent to pct. 5 by interoffice Requested By HUNDLEY, TRACY L Connell, Francis A. Served 10/01/2014 3:30 PM Anticipated Server Constable #5 Anticipated Method Personal Returned 10/01/2014 Serving Officer Holliefield, Robert C Serving Method Personal Delivery sent to pct. 5 by interoffice |
|
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Letter Regarding License from Denton County Sheriff (No Handgun) from Denton County Sheriff (No Handgun) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.