Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Watson, Meghan Blankenship, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Watson, Nathan Peter, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 211th Judicial District Court with Barnes, Margaret presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House211th Judicial District Court |
Request for Issuance of
Date: May 07, 2014Original Petition for Divorce
Date: February 11, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Child Support info updated/added to State Disbursement Unit | |
May 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Change Of Address Notification Party: Watson, Meghan Blankenship Party: Watson, Meghan Blankenship |
|
May 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Cert. of Notice to Employer of Order Withholding (First Service Residential Texas, Inc.: delivered on 5/9/14) (First Service Residential Texas, Inc.: delivered on 5/9/14) |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Issuance of Order Withholding to Employer Made by: Watson, Meghan Blankenship Order Withholding to Employer |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Final Decree sent to Party: Watson, Nathan Peter Party: Watson, Nathan Peter |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Barnes, Margaret E. ) Agreed Final Decree of Divorce for Parties: Watson, Nathan Peter Agreed Final Decree of Divorce |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judicial Docket Entry Prove-up of divorce. Decree entered. MB Prove-up of divorce. Decree entered. MB |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order/Notice to Withhold Income For Child Support (Judicial Officer: Barnes, Margaret E. ) Payor: Watson, Nathan Peter Payor: Watson, Nathan Peter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.