Case Last Refreshed: 14 hours ago
Ebf Holdings, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Wier, Keith, against Bank Of America, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2023 |
CategoryGarnishment |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 23, 2024ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE
Date: December 20, 2023APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: December 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
PLTF MOTION TO RETAIN MOTION - RETAIN |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - BANK OF AMERICA RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE THE ATTACHE LP |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT BANK OF AMERICA |
|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
ISSUE NOTICE - THE ATTACHE LP, DBA THE ATTACHE CIGAR LOUNGE AND/OR THE ATTACHE ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S APP FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.