Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Sellers, Thomas M., against Jpmorgan Chase Bank, Na, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with ACEVES, MARIA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeACEVES, MARIA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 18, 2023 |
CategoryGarnishment |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
MOTION - RETAIN
Date: March 06, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 06, 2024APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: October 18, 2023ISSUE WRIT
Date: October 18, 2023ORDER - RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET
Date: March 11, 2024DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: April 19, 2024DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: March 15, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
192 DWOPNO ACTION Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
192 DWOPNO ACTION Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO RETAIN ORDER - RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
E-SERVED COPY OF ORDER E-SERVE COVER LETTER ORDER TO RETAIN |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO RETAIN MOTION - RETAIN |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
ISSUE WRIT - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ISSUE WRIT |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.