Case Last Refreshed: 23 hours ago
City Of Dallas, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Bishop, Lauren Kelley, against 11532 Harry Hines Blvd Ste 324, Dallas, Texas, Goji Health Services, Llp, Jansong Inc., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with PURDY, MONICA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2023 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House95th District Court |
This complaint is filed by the City of Dallas, Texas against Goji Health Services, LLC d/b/a Goji Therapy, Jangsong, Inc., and 11532 Harry Hines Blvd., Suite 324, Dallas, Texas. The complaint alleges that the property at 11532 Harry Hines Blvd. is be...
PERMANENT INJUNCTION
Date: December 14, 2023TRO HEARING
Date: October 26, 2023NOTE - CLERKS
Date: December 14, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 29, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: October 25, 2023ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: October 25, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 13, 2023Temporary Injunction
Date: December 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL PETITION Temporary Injunction SET BY MORGAN 214-724-8812, IN PERSON, |
|
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT E-SERVE COVER LETTER AGREED PERMANENT INJUNCTION |
|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
AGREED PERMANENT INJUNCTION PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGREED |
|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
AGREED PERMANENT INJUNCTION MAILED TO GOJI HEALTH SERVICES NOTE - CLERKS |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED PERMANENT INJUNCTION NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED TEMPORARY INJUNCTION NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - JANGSONG INC. RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - GOJI HEALTH SERVICES, LLC RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - 11532 HARRY HINES BLVD STE 324, DALLAS, TEXAS RETURN OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.